FL H7079 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum:
Status: Passed on June 17 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-17 - Chapter No. 2013-215
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum:
Status: Passed on June 17 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-17 - Chapter No. 2013-215
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Removes scheduled repeal of public records exemption for certain information contained in records documenting act of domestic violence or sexual violence which are submitted to agency by agency employee.
Title
Review Under Open Government Sunset Review Act
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-05-01 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#10 (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-24 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#242 (Y: 115 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-24 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#242 (Y: 115 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-06-17 | Chapter No. 2013-215 | |
2013-06-14 | Approved by Governor | |
2013-06-10 | Signed by Officers and presented to Governor | |
2013-05-01 | House | Ordered enrolled |
2013-05-01 | Senate | Passed; YEAS 39 NAYS 0 |
2013-05-01 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2013-04-29 | Senate | Placed on 3rd reading |
2013-04-29 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2013-04-29 | Senate | Substituted for CS/SB 304 |
2013-04-29 | Senate | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading |
2013-04-29 | Senate | Withdrawn from Governmental Oversight and Accountability; Rules |
2013-04-24 | Senate | Received |
2013-04-24 | Senate | Referred to Governmental Oversight and Accountability; Rules |
2013-04-24 | Senate | In Messages |
2013-04-24 | House | Passed; YEAS 115 NAYS 0 |
2013-04-24 | House | Read 3rd time |
2013-04-23 | House | Placed on 3rd reading |
2013-04-23 | House | Read 2nd time |
2013-04-19 | House | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 04/23/13 |
2013-03-20 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2013-03-20 | House | Favorable by- State Affairs Committee; YEAS 15 NAYS 0 |
2013-03-18 | House | On Committee agenda-- State Affairs Committee, 03/20/13, 8:00 am, Morris Hall |
2013-03-13 | House | Referred to State Affairs Committee |
2013-03-11 | House | Introduced |
2013-03-08 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S0304 (Similar To) 2013-04-29 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see HB 7079 (Ch. 2013-215)