FL H7079 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (? 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on February 24 2012 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-03-08 - Ordered enrolled -HJ 1245
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 24 2012 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-03-08 - Ordered enrolled -HJ 1245
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Clarifies definitions of terms "normal retirement date" & "vesting"; authorizes distributions to certain members who are terminated from employment for 1 calendar month if member has reached normal retirement date; provides rulemaking authority to DMS & college board of trustees; clarifies provisions related to prohibition of hardship loans or payments; clarifies that retiree who is reemployed in regularly established position after certain date may not be enrolled as renewed member; makes conforming changes to DROP regarding deferral age; provides that benefit for purposes of optional retirement program for State University System includes certain distribution; clarifies when voluntary contributions may be paid out; specifies that definition of term "eligible employee" does not include certain members reemployed in regularly established position; clarifies when benefits may be paid out.
Title
State Retirement
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-03-08 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#47 (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-23 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#820 (Y: 108 N: 8 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-23 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#820 (Y: 108 N: 8 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-08 | Ordered enrolled -HJ 1245 | |
2012-03-08 | CS passed; YEAS 39 NAYS 0 -SJ 1041 | |
2012-03-08 | Withdrawn from Governmental Oversight and Accountability; Budget -SJ 1041 | |
2012-03-05 | Referred to Governmental Oversight and Accountability; Budget -SJ 836 | |
2012-03-05 | Received -SJ 836 | |
2012-02-24 | In Messages | |
2012-02-23 | CS passed; YEAS 108 NAYS 8 -HJ 750 | |
2012-02-23 | Read 3rd time -HJ 749 | |
2012-02-22 | Placed on 3rd reading | |
2012-02-22 | Read 2nd time -HJ 700 | |
2012-02-20 | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 02/22/12 | |
2012-02-20 | Placed on Calendar -HJ 682 | |
2012-02-17 | Pending review of CS -under Rule 7.19(c) | |
2012-02-16 | CS by- State Affairs Committee; YEAS 14 NAYS 1 -HJ 684 | |
2012-02-14 | On Committee agenda-- State Affairs Committee, 02/16/12, 11:30 am, Webster Hall | |
2012-01-30 | Referred to State Affairs Committee -HJ 309 | |
2012-01-27 | Introduced -HJ 287 | |
2012-01-27 | Filed |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
1012 | 875 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
121 | 012 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
121 | 021 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
121 | 0515 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
121 | 055 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
121 | 071 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
121 | 091 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
121 | 122 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
121 | 35 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
121 | 4501 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
121 | 591 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |