FL H7077 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Failed on March 8 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-08 - Died in Appropriations
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Failed on March 8 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-08 - Died in Appropriations
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requires Legislature to appropriate funds for specified purpose; provides requirements for distribution of funds; authorizes reversion of funds in specified circumstances.
Title
Tangible Personal Property Taxation
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-02-29 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#756 (Y: 88 N: 25 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-21 - House - House State Affairs Committee (Y: 14 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-02-21 - House - House State Affairs Committee (Y: 14 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-08 | Senate | Died in Appropriations |
2024-03-01 | Senate | Received |
2024-03-01 | Senate | Referred to Appropriations |
2024-02-29 | Senate | In Messages |
2024-02-29 | House | Passed; YEAS 88, NAYS 25 |
2024-02-29 | House | Read 3rd time |
2024-02-29 | House | Added to Third Reading Calendar |
2024-02-29 | House | Read 2nd time |
2024-02-26 | House | Bill added to Special Order Calendar (2/29/2024) |
2024-02-21 | House | Added to Second Reading Calendar |
2024-02-21 | House | Bill released to House Calendar |
2024-02-21 | House | Reported out of State Affairs Committee |
2024-02-21 | House | Favorable by State Affairs Committee |
2024-02-19 | House | Added to State Affairs Committee agenda |
2024-02-16 | House | Now in State Affairs Committee |
2024-02-16 | House | Referred to State Affairs Committee |
2024-02-15 | House | 1st Reading (Original Filed Version) |
2024-02-15 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H7075 (Related) 2024-03-08 - Died in Appropriations
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
196 | 183 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
218 | 126 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |