FL H7073 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Vetoed on June 27 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-27 - Vetoed by Governor, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 19 (Ch. 2019-99)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Requires initial & renewal fees for international export pharmacy permits; requires late renewal fees & annual permit & inspection fees for international prescription drug wholesale distributors.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Permit and Inspection Fees

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-26 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#16 (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-11 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#77 (Y: 103 N: 11 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-27 Vetoed by Governor, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 19 (Ch. 2019-99)
2019-06-26 Signed by Officers and presented to Governor
2019-04-26HouseOrdered enrolled
2019-04-26SenatePassed; YEAS 35 NAYS 0 559
2019-04-26SenateRead 3rd time
2019-04-26SenateRead 2nd time
2019-04-24SenatePlaced on Special Order Calendar, 04/26/19
2019-04-24SenatePlaced on Calendar, on 2nd reading
2019-04-23SenateFavorable by- Rules; YEAS 16 NAYS 0
2019-04-22SenateReceived
2019-04-18SenateOn Committee agenda-- Rules, 04/23/19, 2:00 pm, 110 Senate Building
2019-04-18SenateReferred to Rules
2019-04-18SenateIn Messages
2019-04-11HousePassed; YEAS 103 NAYS 11
2019-04-11HouseRead 3rd time
2019-04-10HousePlaced on 3rd reading
2019-04-10HouseRead 2nd time
2019-04-04HousePlaced on Special Order Calendar, 04/10/19
2019-03-28HousePlaced on Calendar
2019-03-28HouseFavorable by- Health and Human Services Committee; YEAS 10 NAYS 6
2019-03-26HouseOn Committee agenda-- Health and Human Services Committee, 03/28/19, 8:00 am, Morris Hall
2019-03-19HouseNow in Health and Human Services Committee
2019-03-18HouseFavorable by Appropriations Committee; YEAS 25 NAYS 3
2019-03-14HouseIntroduced
2019-03-14HouseOn Committee agenda-- Appropriations Committee, 03/18/19, 1:00 pm, Webster Hall
2019-03-14HouseReferred to Appropriations Committee; Health and Human Services Committee
2019-03-14HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

H19 (Related) 2019-06-11 - Chapter No. 2019-99
S1452 (Similar To) 2019-05-03 - Died in Health Policy, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 19 (Ch. 2019-99)
S1528 (Similar To) 2019-04-26 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 19 (Ch. 2019-99)

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
4650157Amended CodeSee Bill Text
499012Amended CodeSee Bill Text
499041Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback