FL H7039 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (? 2-1)
Status: Passed on June 30 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-30 - Chapter No. 2020-144
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Repealing chapters 2003-287 and 2006-43, Laws of Florida, relating to the membership, powers, and duties of the Citrus/Hernando Waterways Restoration Council; deleting the advisory council for the My Safe Florida Home Program; removing the ad hoc committee that nominates persons for designation as Great Floridian; deleting the Trap Certificate Technical Advisory and Appeals Board; deleting the advisory board to support specific online degree programs at preeminent state research universities, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Repeal of Advisory Bodies and Programs

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-12 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#742 (Y: 110 N: 1 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-11 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#12 (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-26 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#512 (Y: 70 N: 45 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-06-30 Chapter No. 2020-144
2020-06-29 Approved by Governor
2020-06-17 Signed by Officers and presented to Governor
2020-03-12HouseOrdered engrossed, then enrolled
2020-03-12HouseCS passed as amended; YEAS 110 NAYS 1
2020-03-12HouseConcurred in 1 amendment(s) (169888)
2020-03-11HouseIn returning messages
2020-03-11SenateCS passed as amended; YEAS 40 NAYS 0
2020-03-11SenateRead 3rd time
2020-03-10SenatePlaced on 3rd reading
2020-03-10SenateAmendment(s) adopted (169888)
2020-03-10SenateRead 2nd time
2020-03-10SenateSubstituted for CS/SB 1636
2020-03-10SenatePlaced on Calendar, on 2nd reading
2020-03-10SenateWithdrawn from Governmental Oversight and Accountability; Community Affairs; Rules
2020-03-05SenateReceived
2020-03-05SenateReferred to Governmental Oversight and Accountability; Community Affairs; Rules
2020-03-03SenateIn Messages
2020-02-26HouseCS passed; YEAS 70 NAYS 45
2020-02-26HouseRead 3rd time
2020-02-26HouseRead 2nd time
2020-02-20HousePlaced on Special Order Calendar, 02/26/20
2020-02-17HousePlaced on Calendar
2020-02-14HouseCS by Health and Human Services Committee read 1st time
2020-02-14HousePending review of CS -under Rule 7.18(c)
2020-02-12HouseCS by- Health and Human Services Committee; YEAS 17 NAYS 0
2020-02-10HouseOn Committee agenda-- Health and Human Services Committee, 02/12/20, 10:00 am, Morris Hall
2020-01-30HouseNow in Health and Human Services Committee
2020-01-30HouseFavorable by Education Committee; YEAS 12 NAYS 0
2020-01-28HouseOn Committee agenda-- Education Committee, 01/30/20, 9:00 am, Reed Hall
2020-01-22HouseReferred to Education Committee; Health and Human Services Committee
2020-01-21HouseIntroduced
2020-01-21HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

S1636 (Similar To) 2020-03-10 - Laid on Table, refer to CS/HB 7039
H1013 (Similar To) 2020-03-14 - Died in Education
H6027 (Similar To) 2020-03-03 - Ordered enrolled
S388 (Similar To) 2020-02-26 - Laid on Table, refer to HB 6027
S1616 (Similar To) 2020-01-10 - Withdrawn prior to introduction
S1688 (Similar To) 2020-03-14 - Died in Appropriations
H7063 (Similar To) 2020-03-14 - Died on Calendar

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
10017065Amended CodeSee Bill Text
100277Amended CodeSee Bill Text
100283Amended CodeSee Bill Text
2155586Amended CodeSee Bill Text
2670731Amended CodeSee Bill Text
3734597Amended CodeSee Bill Text
37686Amended CodeSee Bill Text
378032Amended CodeSee Bill Text
378033Amended CodeSee Bill Text
378034Amended CodeSee Bill Text
3792524Amended CodeSee Bill Text
379361Amended CodeSee Bill Text
379367Amended CodeSee Bill Text
3793671Amended CodeSee Bill Text
40342Amended CodeSee Bill Text
40387Amended CodeSee Bill Text
408910Amended CodeSee Bill Text
409997Amended CodeSee Bill Text
411226Amended CodeSee Bill Text
43005Amended CodeSee Bill Text
57124Amended CodeSee Bill Text
57128Amended CodeSee Bill Text
595701Amended CodeSee Bill Text
603203Amended CodeSee Bill Text
603204Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback