FL H1013 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum:
Status: Introduced on December 19 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-02-21 - Placed on Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

Deletes Office of Early Learning; creates Division of Early Learning within DOE; revises provisions relating to early learning coalitions; VPK & school readiness programs; & DOE responsibilities & duties relating to early learning.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Early Learning and Early Grade Success

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-02-21HousePlaced on Calendar
2020-02-20HouseCS/CS/CS by Education Committee read 1st time
2020-02-20HousePending review of CS -under Rule 7.18(c)
2020-02-18HouseCS/CS/CS by- Education Committee; YEAS 15 NAYS 0
2020-02-14HouseOn Committee agenda-- Education Committee, 02/18/20, 3:00 pm, Reed Hall
2020-02-12HouseNow in Education Committee
2020-02-11HouseCS/CS by PreK-12 Appropriations Subcommittee read 1st time
2020-02-11HousePending review of CS under Rule 7.18(c)
2020-02-10HouseCS/CS by PreK-12 Appropriations Subcommittee; YEAS 8 NAYS 0
2020-02-06HouseOn Committee agenda-- PreK-12 Appropriations Subcommittee, 02/10/20, 1:30 pm, Reed Hall
2020-02-03HouseNow in PreK-12 Appropriations Subcommittee
2020-01-31HouseCS by PreK-12 Innovation Subcommittee read 1st time
2020-01-31HousePending review of CS under Rule 7.18(c)
2020-01-28HouseCS by PreK-12 Innovation Subcommittee; YEAS 17 NAYS 0
2020-01-24HouseOn Committee agenda-- PreK-12 Innovation Subcommittee, 01/28/20, 3:30 pm, Reed Hall
2020-01-14HouseIntroduced
2020-01-07HouseReferred to PreK-12 Innovation Subcommittee; PreK-12 Appropriations Subcommittee; Education Committee
2019-12-19HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

S1616 (Similar To) 2020-01-10 - Withdrawn prior to introduction
S1636 (Similar To) 2020-02-21 - On Committee agenda-- Rules, 02/26/20, 9:00 am, 110 Senate Building
S1688 (Similar To) 2020-02-20 - On Committee agenda-- Appropriations Subcommittee on Education, 02/25/20, 9:00 am, 412 Knott Building
H7039 (Similar To) 2020-02-20 - Placed on Special Order Calendar, 02/26/20

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
100001Amended CodeSee Bill Text
100002Amended CodeSee Bill Text
100003Amended CodeSee Bill Text
100004Amended CodeSee Bill Text
100021Amended CodeSee Bill Text
100102Amended CodeSee Bill Text
100103Amended CodeSee Bill Text
100110Amended CodeSee Bill Text
100111Amended CodeSee Bill Text
1001213Amended CodeSee Bill Text
1001215Amended CodeSee Bill Text
100123Amended CodeSee Bill Text
100170Amended CodeSee Bill Text
1001706Amended CodeSee Bill Text
100222Amended CodeSee Bill Text
100232Amended CodeSee Bill Text
100234Amended CodeSee Bill Text
100236Amended CodeSee Bill Text
100253Amended CodeSee Bill Text
100255Amended CodeSee Bill Text
100257Amended CodeSee Bill Text
100259Amended CodeSee Bill Text
100261Amended CodeSee Bill Text
100263Amended CodeSee Bill Text
100267Amended CodeSee Bill Text
100268Amended CodeSee Bill Text
100269Amended CodeSee Bill Text
100271Amended CodeSee Bill Text
100272Amended CodeSee Bill Text
100273Amended CodeSee Bill Text
100275Amended CodeSee Bill Text
100277Amended CodeSee Bill Text
100279Amended CodeSee Bill Text
100281Amended CodeSee Bill Text
100282Amended CodeSee Bill Text
100283Amended CodeSee Bill Text
100284Amended CodeSee Bill Text
100285Amended CodeSee Bill Text
100288Amended CodeSee Bill Text
100289Amended CodeSee Bill Text
1002895Amended CodeSee Bill Text
100291Amended CodeSee Bill Text
100292Amended CodeSee Bill Text
100293Amended CodeSee Bill Text
100294Amended CodeSee Bill Text
1002945Amended CodeSee Bill Text
100295Amended CodeSee Bill Text
100296Amended CodeSee Bill Text
100297Amended CodeSee Bill Text
1002995Amended CodeSee Bill Text
1003575Amended CodeSee Bill Text
100701Amended CodeSee Bill Text
10082125Amended CodeSee Bill Text
100825Amended CodeSee Bill Text
100831Amended CodeSee Bill Text
100832Amended CodeSee Bill Text
100833Amended CodeSee Bill Text
101162Amended CodeSee Bill Text
20055Amended CodeSee Bill Text
2015Amended CodeSee Bill Text
21208Amended CodeSee Bill Text
38314Amended CodeSee Bill Text
39202Amended CodeSee Bill Text
39604Amended CodeSee Bill Text
391308Amended CodeSee Bill Text
40226Amended CodeSee Bill Text
402281Amended CodeSee Bill Text
402305Amended CodeSee Bill Text
402315Amended CodeSee Bill Text
40256Amended CodeSee Bill Text
411226Amended CodeSee Bill Text
411227Amended CodeSee Bill Text
414295Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback