FL H7035 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 25 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-07 - Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 25 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-07 - Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Repeals authority of Governor to appoint & commission private secretary.
Title
Governor's Private Secretary
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-03-24 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#79 (Y: 117 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-07 | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration | |
2011-03-25 | In Messages | |
2011-03-24 | Read 2nd time -HJ 299 | |
2011-03-22 | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 03/24/11 | |
2011-03-17 | Favorable by- State Affairs Committee; YEAS 17 NAYS 0 -HJ 260 | |
2011-03-15 | On Committee agenda-- State Affairs Committee, 03/17/11, 8:00 am, Morris Hall | |
2011-03-14 | Referred to State Affairs Committee -HJ 223 | |
2011-03-10 | Filed |