FL H7033 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 27 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-02-09 - Laid on Table, refer to SB 846
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 27 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-02-09 - Laid on Table, refer to SB 846
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Adopts Florida Statutes 2022 & designates portions thereof that are to constitute official law of state; provides that Florida Statutes 2022 shall be effective immediately upon publication; provides that general laws enacted during May 17-21, 2021, special session & prior thereto & not included in Florida Statutes 2022 are repealed; provides that general laws enacted during November 15-19, 2021, special session & 2022 regular session are not repealed by this adoption act.
Title
Florida Statutes
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-09 | House | Laid on Table, refer to SB 846 |
2022-02-09 | House | Substituted SB 846 |
2022-02-03 | House | Bill added to Special Order Calendar (2/9/2022) |
2022-01-31 | House | Added to Second Reading Calendar |
2022-01-31 | House | Bill referred to House Calendar |
2022-01-28 | House | 1st Reading (Original Filed Version) |
2022-01-27 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S846 (Same As) 2022-02-25 - Chapter No. 2022-3
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
11 | 2421 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
11 | 2422 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
11 | 2424 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
11 | 2425 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |