FL H7027 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 27 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-27 - Chapter No. 2018-112
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 27 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-27 - Chapter No. 2018-112
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Conforms Florida Statutes to directive of Legislature in s. 9, ch. 2012-116, LOF, codified as s. 11.242(5)(j), F.S., to prepare reviser's bill to omit all statutes & laws, or parts thereof, which grant duplicative, redundant, or unused rulemaking authority.
Title
Florida Statutes/Rulemaking Repeals
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-05 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-14 - House - House: Third Reading (Y: 114 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-14 - House - House: Third Reading (Y: 114 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-27 | Chapter No. 2018-112 | |
2018-03-23 | Approved by Governor | |
2018-03-16 | Signed by Officers and presented to Governor | |
2018-03-05 | House | Ordered enrolled |
2018-03-05 | Senate | Passed; YEAS 36 NAYS 0 |
2018-03-05 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2018-03-02 | Senate | Placed on 3rd reading |
2018-03-02 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2018-03-02 | Senate | Substituted for SB 1346 |
2018-03-02 | Senate | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading |
2018-03-02 | Senate | Withdrawn from Rules |
2018-02-21 | Senate | Received |
2018-02-20 | Senate | Referred to Rules |
2018-02-20 | Senate | In Messages |
2018-02-14 | House | Passed; YEAS 115 NAYS 0 |
2018-02-14 | House | Read 3rd time |
2018-02-14 | House | Read 2nd time |
2018-02-08 | House | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 02/14/18 |
2018-01-10 | House | Referred to Calendar |
2018-01-09 | House | Introduced |
2018-01-09 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S1346 (Same As) 2018-03-02 - Laid on Table, refer to HB 7027
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
101 | 5614 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
101 | 6952 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
102 | 141 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
102 | 166 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
122 | 34 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
20 | 2551 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
201 | 02 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
394 | 907 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
395 | 602 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
395 | 603 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
395 | 604 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |