FL H7025 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 27 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-27 - Chapter No. 2018-111
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Repeals specified provisions that have become inoperative by noncurrent repeal or expiration & may be omitted from 2018 Florida Statutes only through reviser's bill duly enacted by Legislature.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Florida Statutes/Non-current Repeals or Expiration

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-05 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#6 (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-14 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#591 (Y: 114 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-27 Chapter No. 2018-111
2018-03-23 Approved by Governor
2018-03-16 Signed by Officers and presented to Governor
2018-03-05HouseOrdered enrolled
2018-03-05SenatePassed; YEAS 32 NAYS 0
2018-03-05SenateRead 3rd time
2018-03-02SenatePlaced on 3rd reading
2018-03-02SenateRead 2nd time
2018-03-02SenateSubstituted for SB 1344
2018-03-02SenatePlaced on Calendar, on 2nd reading
2018-03-02SenateWithdrawn from Rules
2018-02-21SenateReceived
2018-02-20SenateReferred to Rules
2018-02-20SenateIn Messages
2018-02-14HousePassed; YEAS 115 NAYS 0 568
2018-02-14HouseRead 3rd time
2018-02-14HouseRead 2nd time
2018-02-08HousePlaced on Special Order Calendar, 02/14/18
2018-01-10HouseReferred to Calendar
2018-01-09HouseIntroduced
2018-01-09HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

S1344 (Same As) 2018-03-02 - Laid on Table, refer to HB 7025

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
100834Amended CodeSee Bill Text
1012341Amended CodeSee Bill Text
161143Amended CodeSee Bill Text
1931552Amended CodeSee Bill Text
21208Amended CodeSee Bill Text
216292Amended CodeSee Bill Text
218417Amended CodeSee Bill Text
218418Amended CodeSee Bill Text
218421Amended CodeSee Bill Text
218422Amended CodeSee Bill Text
259105Amended CodeSee Bill Text
272136Amended CodeSee Bill Text
29637Amended CodeSee Bill Text
32203Amended CodeSee Bill Text
3274105Amended CodeSee Bill Text
32876Amended CodeSee Bill Text
339135Amended CodeSee Bill Text
375075Amended CodeSee Bill Text
380507Amended CodeSee Bill Text
39001Amended CodeSee Bill Text
390011Amended CodeSee Bill Text
393065Amended CodeSee Bill Text
394462Amended CodeSee Bill Text
4037095Amended CodeSee Bill Text
4080436Amended CodeSee Bill Text
4091666Amended CodeSee Bill Text
4205087Amended CodeSee Bill Text
4209072Amended CodeSee Bill Text
43082Amended CodeSee Bill Text
66301Amended CodeSee Bill Text
663041Amended CodeSee Bill Text
663532Amended CodeSee Bill Text
893055Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback