FL H7015 | 2022 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 12 2022 - 25% progression
Action: 2022-01-25 - Now in State Affairs Committee
Pending: House State Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Removes scheduled repeal of exemption from public records requirements for for criminal intelligence & criminal investigative information that reveals personal identifying information of witness to murder for specified period.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

OGSR/Identity of a Witness to Murder

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2022-01-25 - House - House Criminal Justice & Public Safety Subcommittee (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2022-01-25HouseNow in State Affairs Committee
2022-01-25HouseReported out of Criminal Justice & Public Safety Subcommittee
2022-01-25HouseFavorable by Criminal Justice & Public Safety Subcommittee
2022-01-21HouseAdded to Criminal Justice & Public Safety Subcommittee agenda
2022-01-13House1st Reading (Original Filed Version)
2022-01-13HouseNow in Criminal Justice & Public Safety Subcommittee
2022-01-13HouseReferred to State Affairs Committee
2022-01-13HouseReferred to Criminal Justice & Public Safety Subcommittee
2022-01-12HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

S1282 (Similar To) 2022-01-11 - Introduced
S7032 (Same As) 2022-01-26 - Introduced

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
119071Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback