FL H7011 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Introduced on November 17 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-01-14 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see SB 672 (Ch. 2016-2)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on November 17 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-01-14 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see SB 672 (Ch. 2016-2)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Creates "Florida Postsecondary Comprehensive Transition Program Act"; establishes student eligibility requirements for enrollment in program; establishes Florida Center for Students with Unique Abilities; establishes Florida Postsecondary Comprehensive Transition Program Scholarship for certain qualified students; authorizes certain school districts and charter schools to be eligible to receive incentive payments for implementing a standard student attire policy that meets certain criteria; revises provisions relating to Florida Personal Learning Scholarship Accounts Program & Florida Tax Credit Scholarship Program; provides appropriations.
Title
Educational Options
Sponsors
House Education Appropriations Subcommittee | Rep. Erik Fresen [R] | Rep. Michael Bileca [R] | Rep. Larry Ahern [R] |
Rep. Robert Cortes [R] | Sen. Manny Diaz [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-01-14 | House | Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see SB 672 (Ch. 2016-2) |
2016-01-14 | House | Substituted SB 672 |
2016-01-12 | House | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 01/14/16 |
2016-01-12 | House | Introduced |
2015-12-03 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2015-12-03 | House | Favorable by- Education Committee; YEAS 16 NAYS 1 |
2015-11-25 | House | On Committee agenda-- Education Committee, 12/03/15, 12:00 pm, Reed Hall |
2015-11-23 | House | Referred to Education Committee |
2015-11-17 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S0672 (Same As) 2016-01-21 - Chapter No. 2016-2
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
1001 | 43 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1002 | 33 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1002 | 385 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1002 | 395 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1004 | 6495 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1009 | 971 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1009 | 98 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1009 | 981 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1011 | 78 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2016/7011 |
Text | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2016/7011/BillText/Filed/PDF |