FL H7007 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 23 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-03-10 - Substituted SB 944
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 23 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-03-10 - Substituted SB 944
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Deletes provisions that have expired, have become obsolete, have had their effect, have served their purpose, or have been impliedly repealed or superseded; replaces incorrect cross-references & citations; corrects grammatical, typographical, & like errors; removes inconsistencies, redundancies, & unnecessary repetition in statutes; improves clarity of statutes & facilitates their correct interpretation, etc.
Title
Florida Statutes
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-10 | Substituted SB 944 | |
2011-03-08 | Introduced -HJ 143 | |
2011-03-07 | Referred to Calendar -HJ 143 | |
2011-02-23 | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S0944 () 2011-03-15 - Ordered enrolled -SJ 234
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
1002 | 69 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1003 | 428 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1003 | 429 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1008 | 34 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
102 | 012 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
112 | 534 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
16 | 0155 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
163 | 3202 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
206 | 608 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
213 | 67 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
28 | 36 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
283 | 3 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
283 | 30 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
283 | 33 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
283 | 43 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
285 | 71 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
285 | 710 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
288 | 0659 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
288 | 106 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
288 | 9604 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
316 | 008 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
319 | 3 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
319 | 30 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
320 | 03 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
321 | 05 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
327 | 73 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
339 | 135 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
341 | 302 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
369 | 317 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
373 | 036 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
376 | 011 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
380 | 0552 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
380 | 503 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
381 | 0065 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
401 | 465 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
402 | 7305 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
403 | 7032 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
403 | 891 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
411 | 01 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
435 | 03 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
443 | 091 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
443 | 131 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
443 | 141 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
479 | 01 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
494 | 00331 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
497 | 372 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
550 | 334 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
550 | 3345 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
553 | 77 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
61 | 3 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
61 | 30 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
624 | 31 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
624 | 310 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
627 | 4605 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
627 | 711 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
633 | 081 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
677 | 105 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
718 | 111 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
893 | 055 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
893 | 0551 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2011/7007 |
Text | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2011/7007/BillText/Filed/HTML |