FL H7001 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 6-1)
Status: Passed on March 16 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-16 - Signed by Officers and filed with Secretary of State
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Proposes amendment to State Constitution to prohibit a state tax or fee from being imposed or raised except through legislation approved by two-thirds of each house of legislature; requires a state tax or fee imposed or raised to be contained in separate bill that contains no other subject.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Supermajority Vote for State Taxes or Fees

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-05 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#9 (Y: 25 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-25 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#520 (Y: 80 N: 29 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-16 Signed by Officers and filed with Secretary of State
2018-03-05HouseOrdered enrolled
2018-03-05SenatePassed; YEAS 25 NAYS 13
2018-03-05SenateRead 3rd time
2018-03-02SenatePlaced on 3rd reading
2018-03-02SenateAmendment(s) failed (751148)
2018-03-02SenateRead 2nd time
2018-02-28SenatePlaced on Special Order Calendar, 03/02/18
2018-02-28SenatePlaced on Calendar, on 2nd reading
2018-02-27SenateFavorable by- Appropriations; YEAS 13 NAYS 7
2018-02-22SenateOn Committee agenda-- Appropriations, 02/27/18, 11:00 am, 412 Knott Building
2018-02-21SenateNow in Appropriations
2018-02-20SenateSubcommittee Recommendation: Favorable with 1 amendment(s) by Appropriations Subcommittee on Finance and Tax (813842); YEAS 4 NAYS 2
2018-02-15SenateOn Committee agenda-- Appropriations Subcommittee on Finance and Tax, 02/20/18, 9:00 am, 401 Senate Office Building
2018-02-01SenateReceived
2018-02-01SenateReferred to Appropriations Subcommittee on Finance and Tax; Appropriations
2018-01-31SenateIn Messages
2018-01-25HousePassed; YEAS 80 NAYS 29
2018-01-25HouseRead 3rd time
2018-01-24HousePlaced on 3rd reading
2018-01-24HouseRead 2nd time
2018-01-18HousePlaced on Special Order Calendar, 01/24/18
2018-01-09HousePlaced on Calendar
2018-01-09HouseFavorable by- Appropriations Committee; YEAS 20 NAYS 8
2018-01-09HouseIntroduced
2018-01-05HouseOn Committee agenda-- Appropriations Committee, 01/09/18, 4:30 pm, Webster Hall
2017-11-09HouseReferred to Appropriations Committee
2017-11-08HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

S1742 (Similar To) 2018-03-10 - Died in Appropriations

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback