FL H6515 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (? 3-1)
Status: Introduced on November 10 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-07 - Laid on Table, refer to CS/CS/SB 80
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on November 10 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-07 - Laid on Table, refer to CS/CS/SB 80
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Provides for relief of Christeia Jones, as guardian of Logan Grant, Denard Maybin, Jr., & Lanard Maybin; provides appropriation to compensate them for injuries & damages sustained as result of automobile accident caused by Trooper Raul Umana, employee of FHP, division of DHSMV; provides limitation on payment of compensation & specified fees.
Title
Relief/Christeia Jones/Department of Highway Safety and Motor Vehicles
Sponsors
House Judiciary Committee | House Appropriations Committee | House Civil Justice and Property Rights Subcommittee | Rep. Lawrence McClure [R] |
Roll Calls
2022-02-23 - House - House Judiciary Committee (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-23 - House - House Judiciary Committee (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-17 - House - House Appropriations Committee (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2022-01-27 - House - House Civil Justice & Property Rights Subcommittee (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-23 - House - House Judiciary Committee (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-17 - House - House Appropriations Committee (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2022-01-27 - House - House Civil Justice & Property Rights Subcommittee (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-07 | House | Laid on Table, refer to CS/CS/SB 80 |
2022-02-25 | House | Added to Second Reading Calendar |
2022-02-25 | House | Bill referred to House Calendar |
2022-02-24 | House | 1st Reading (Committee Substitute 3) |
2022-02-24 | House | CS Filed |
2022-02-24 | House | Laid on Table under Rule 7.18(a) |
2022-02-23 | House | Reported out of Judiciary Committee |
2022-02-23 | House | Favorable with CS by Judiciary Committee |
2022-02-21 | House | Added to Judiciary Committee agenda |
2022-02-18 | House | Now in Judiciary Committee |
2022-02-18 | House | Referred to Judiciary Committee |
2022-02-17 | House | 1st Reading (Committee Substitute 2) |
2022-02-17 | House | CS Filed |
2022-02-17 | House | Laid on Table under Rule 7.18(a) |
2022-02-17 | House | Reported out of Appropriations Committee |
2022-02-17 | House | Favorable with CS by Appropriations Committee |
2022-02-15 | House | Added to Appropriations Committee agenda |
2022-01-31 | House | Now in Appropriations Committee |
2022-01-31 | House | Referred to Judiciary Committee |
2022-01-31 | House | Referred to Appropriations Committee |
2022-01-28 | House | 1st Reading (Committee Substitute 1) |
2022-01-27 | House | CS Filed |
2022-01-27 | House | Laid on Table under Rule 7.18(a) |
2022-01-27 | House | Reported out of Civil Justice & Property Rights Subcommittee |
2022-01-27 | House | Favorable with CS by Civil Justice & Property Rights Subcommittee |
2022-01-25 | House | Added to Civil Justice & Property Rights Subcommittee agenda |
2022-01-11 | House | 1st Reading (Original Filed Version) |
2021-11-19 | House | Now in Civil Justice & Property Rights Subcommittee |
2021-11-19 | House | Referred to Judiciary Committee |
2021-11-19 | House | Referred to Appropriations Committee |
2021-11-19 | House | Referred to Civil Justice & Property Rights Subcommittee |
2021-11-10 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S80 (Same As) 2022-05-20 - Approved by Governor
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
768 | 28 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
849 | 92 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |