FL H6513 | 2022 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on October 20 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2022-01-14 - Added to Civil Justice & Property Rights Subcommittee agenda
Pending: House Civil Justice and Property Rights Subcommittee Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Provides appropriation to Kareem Hawari as compensation for injuries & damages resulting from negligence of Osceola County School Board employees; provides limitation on payment of attorney fees.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relief/Kareem Hawari/Osceola County School Board

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2022-01-14HouseAdded to Civil Justice & Property Rights Subcommittee agenda
2022-01-11House1st Reading (Original Filed Version)
2021-11-05HouseNow in Civil Justice & Property Rights Subcommittee
2021-11-05HouseReferred to Judiciary Committee
2021-11-05HouseReferred to Civil Justice & Property Rights Subcommittee
2021-10-20HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

S82 (Same As) 2022-01-11 - Introduced

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback