FL S0082 | 2022 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on August 2 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2022-01-11 - Introduced
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Providing for the relief of Kareem Hawari by the Osceola County School Board; providing an appropriation to Mr. Hawari to compensate him for injuries and damages sustained as a result of the negligence of employees of the Osceola County School Board; providing a limitation on compensation and the payment of attorney fees, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relief of Kareem Hawari by the Osceola County School Board

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2022-01-10 - Senate - Senate Judiciary (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2022-01-11SenateIntroduced
2022-01-11SenateNow in Education
2022-01-10SenateFavorable by Judiciary; YEAS 10 NAYS 0
2022-01-03SenateOn Committee agenda-- Judiciary, 01/10/22, 4:00 pm, 412 Knott Building
2021-12-02SenateNow in Judiciary
2021-12-02SenateReferences corrected to Judiciary; Education; Rules
2021-12-02SenateOriginal reference(s)- removed: Special Master on Claim Bills
2021-09-21SenateReferred to Special Master on Claim Bills; Judiciary; Education; Rules
2021-08-02SenateFiled

Same As/Similar To

H6513 (Same As) 2022-01-14 - Added to Civil Justice & Property Rights Subcommittee agenda

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback