FL H6505 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 5 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-05 - Died in Civil Justice and Claims Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 5 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-05 - Died in Civil Justice and Claims Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Provides appropriation from DACS & Board of Trustees of Internal Improvement Trust Fund to compensate Shuler Limited Partnership for damages sustained as result of negligence of employees of Florida Forest Service & violation of s. 590.13, F.S.; provides limitation on payment of fees & costs.
Title
Relief/Shuler Limited Partnership/Department of Agriculture & Consumer Services
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-05 | House | Died in Civil Justice and Claims Subcommittee |
2017-05-05 | House | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2017-03-07 | House | Introduced |
2017-02-06 | House | Referred to Civil Justice and Claims Subcommittee; Agriculture and Natural Resources Appropriations Subcommittee; Judiciary Committee |
2017-01-20 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S0022 (Same As) 2017-05-05 - Died in Special Master on Claim Bills
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2017/6505 |
Text | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2017/6505/BillText/Filed/PDF |