FL H6083 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on April 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-30 - Died in Criminal Justice & Public Safety Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on April 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-30 - Died in Criminal Justice & Public Safety Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Removes provisions authorizing seizure of firearms from persons in certain circumstances, prohibition on firearms ownership or possession until removal of firearm possession & firearm ownership disability, prohibition on persons younger than 21 years of age from purchasing firearms, certain exemptions from firearms purchase waiting period, ban on bump-fire stock, & statute authorizing risk protection orders.
Title
Removing Firearm Regulations
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-30 | House | Died in Criminal Justice & Public Safety Subcommittee |
2021-03-02 | House | 1st Reading (Original Filed Version) |
2021-02-28 | House | Now in Criminal Justice & Public Safety Subcommittee |
2021-02-28 | House | Referred to Judiciary Committee |
2021-02-28 | House | Referred to Criminal Justice & Public Safety Subcommittee |
2021-02-22 | House | Filed |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
394 | 4599 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
394 | 463 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
790 | 064 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
790 | 065 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
790 | 0655 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
790 | 222 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
790 | 401 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/6083 |
Text | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/6083/BillText/Filed/PDF |