FL H6057 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on April 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-30 - Died in Criminal Justice & Public Safety Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on April 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-30 - Died in Criminal Justice & Public Safety Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Repeals provisions relating to law enforcement officers' & correctional officers' rights; repeals provisions relating to processing & reviewing complaints, inactive investigations, & officer statements.
Title
Law Enforcement Officers' and Correctional Officers' Rights
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-30 | House | Died in Criminal Justice & Public Safety Subcommittee |
2021-03-02 | House | 1st Reading (Original Filed Version) |
2021-02-18 | House | Now in Criminal Justice & Public Safety Subcommittee |
2021-02-18 | House | Referred to Judiciary Committee |
2021-02-18 | House | Referred to Criminal Justice & Public Safety Subcommittee |
2021-02-03 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H1609 (Similar To) 2021-04-30 - Died in Criminal Justice & Public Safety Subcommittee
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
112 | 532 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
112 | 533 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/6057 |
Text | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/6057/BillText/Filed/PDF |