FL H6055 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-03 - Died in Criminal Justice Subcommittee, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 7125 (Ch. 2019-167)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-03 - Died in Criminal Justice Subcommittee, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 7125 (Ch. 2019-167)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Removes provisions that provide limitation on total sales of specified corporation of certain products offered for purchase to state agency.
Title
Prison Industry Programs
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-03 | House | Died in Criminal Justice Subcommittee, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 7125 (Ch. 2019-167) |
2019-05-03 | House | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2019-03-05 | House | Introduced |
2019-03-04 | House | Referred to Criminal Justice Subcommittee; Appropriations Committee; Judiciary Committee |
2019-02-28 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S1612 (Same As) 2019-05-03 - Died in Rules, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 7125 (Ch. 2019-167)
H7125 (Similar To) 2019-07-01 - Chapter No. 2019-167, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 1021 (Ch. 2019-91), CS/SB 160 (Ch. 2019-45), CS/SB 828 (Ch. 2019-50), SB 910 (Ch. 2019-61), SB 1136 (Ch. 2019-53), CS/CS/SB 1418 (Ch. 2019-134)
H7125 (Similar To) 2019-07-01 - Chapter No. 2019-167, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 1021 (Ch. 2019-91), CS/SB 160 (Ch. 2019-45), CS/SB 828 (Ch. 2019-50), SB 910 (Ch. 2019-61), SB 1136 (Ch. 2019-53), CS/CS/SB 1418 (Ch. 2019-134)
Code Citations
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/6055 |
Text | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/6055/BillText/Filed/PDF |