FL H6035 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on March 14 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-14 - Died in Higher Education and Career Readiness Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on March 14 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-14 - Died in Higher Education and Career Readiness Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Removes exemption from specified tuition & fees for students enrolled in approved apprenticeship programs at specified institutions.
Title
Postsecondary Fee Exemptions
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-14 | House | Died in Higher Education and Career Readiness Subcommittee |
2020-03-14 | House | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2020-01-14 | House | Introduced |
2019-10-30 | House | Referred to Higher Education and Career Readiness Subcommittee; Higher Education Appropriations Subcommittee; Education Committee |
2019-10-23 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S1322 (Same As) 2020-03-14 - Died in Education
Code Citations
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2020/6035 |
Text | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2020/6035/BillText/Filed/PDF |