FL H6015 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on March 14 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-14 - Died in Business and Professions Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on March 14 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-14 - Died in Business and Professions Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Repeals provisions, relating to testing & approval of sparklers, sale of fireworks, seizure of illegal fireworks, restrictions upon storage of sparklers, & penalties for violations.
Title
Fireworks
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-14 | House | Died in Business and Professions Subcommittee |
2020-03-14 | House | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2020-01-14 | House | Introduced |
2019-09-23 | House | Referred to Business and Professions Subcommittee; Local, Federal and Veterans Affairs Subcommittee; Commerce Committee |
2019-08-28 | House | Filed |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
791 | 01 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
791 | 013 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
791 | 02 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
791 | 05 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
791 | 055 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
791 | 06 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2020/6015 |
Text | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2020/6015/BillText/Filed/PDF |