FL H6011 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-03 - Died in State Affairs Committee, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/CS/HB 905 (Ch. 2019-153)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-03 - Died in State Affairs Committee, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/CS/HB 905 (Ch. 2019-153)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requires specified fees to be used indefinitely to reimburse local governmental entity for direct actual costs of operating specified fire station.
Title
Alligator Alley Toll Road
Sponsors
Rep. Bob Rommel [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-03 | House | Died in State Affairs Committee, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/CS/HB 905 (Ch. 2019-153) |
2019-05-03 | House | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2019-04-08 | House | On Committee agenda-- State Affairs Committee, 04/10/19, 8:00 am, Morris Hall -- Temporarily postponed |
2019-04-03 | House | Now in State Affairs Committee |
2019-04-02 | House | Favorable by Transportation and Tourism Appropriations Subcommittee; YEAS 12 NAYS 0 |
2019-03-29 | House | On Committee agenda-- Transportation and Tourism Appropriations Subcommittee, 04/02/19, 1:00 pm, Reed Hall |
2019-03-05 | House | Introduced |
2019-02-21 | House | Now in Transportation and Tourism Appropriations Subcommittee |
2019-02-21 | House | Favorable by Transportation and Infrastructure Subcommittee; YEAS 11 NAYS 0 |
2019-02-14 | House | On Committee agenda-- Transportation and Infrastructure Subcommittee, 02/21/19, 10:30 am, Reed Hall |
2019-01-23 | House | Referred to Transportation and Infrastructure Subcommittee; Transportation and Tourism Appropriations Subcommittee; State Affairs Committee |
2019-01-10 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S72 (Same As) 2019-05-03 - Died on Calendar, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/CS/HB 905 (Ch. 2019-153)
H905 (Similar To) 2019-06-27 - Chapter No. 2019-153, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/CS/HB 385 (Ch. 2019-169), CS/CS/HB 827 (Ch. 2019-86)
H905 (Similar To) 2019-06-27 - Chapter No. 2019-153, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/CS/HB 385 (Ch. 2019-169), CS/CS/HB 827 (Ch. 2019-86)
Code Citations
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/6011 |
Text | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/6011/BillText/Filed/PDF |