FL H6009 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-0)
Status: Failed on May 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-03 - Died in Civil Justice Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-0)
Status: Failed on May 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-03 - Died in Civil Justice Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Repeals provisions relating to marriages between persons of the same sex.
Title
Marriage Equality
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-03 | House | Died in Civil Justice Subcommittee |
2019-05-03 | House | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2019-03-05 | House | Introduced |
2019-01-16 | House | Referred to Civil Justice Subcommittee; Children, Families and Seniors Subcommittee; Judiciary Committee |
2019-01-07 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S254 (Similar To) 2019-05-03 - Died in Judiciary
Code Citations
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/6009 |
Text | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/6009/BillText/Filed/PDF |