FL H5401 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 20 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-20 - Chapter No. 2013-54, companion bill(s) passed, see SB 1500 (Ch. 2013-40)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 20 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-20 - Chapter No. 2013-54, companion bill(s) passed, see SB 1500 (Ch. 2013-40)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Requires EOG to establish single website providing access to other websites; requires office to establish website providing information about fiscal planning for state & specifies information to be included on website; requires DMS to maintain website that provides current information on state employees & officers; requires CFO to establish & maintain secure contract tracking system; requires that exempt & confidential information be redacted from contracts & procurement documents posted on system; authorizes CFO to regulate & prohibit posting of certain information that could facilitate identity theft or cause harm; creates User Experience Task Force to develop & recommend design for consolidating existing state-managed websites, etc.
Title
Transparency in Government Spending
Sponsors
Rep. Ricardo Rangel [D] | Sen. Jose Rodriguez [D] | House Government Operations Appropriations Subcommittee | Rep. Clay Ingram [R] |
Roll Calls
2013-05-03 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#33 (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-02 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#429 (Y: 117 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-16 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#2 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-12 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#85 (Y: 115 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-02 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#429 (Y: 117 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-16 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#2 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-12 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#85 (Y: 115 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-20 | Chapter No. 2013-54, companion bill(s) passed, see SB 1500 (Ch. 2013-40) | |
2013-05-20 | Approved by Governor | |
2013-05-09 | Signed by Officers and presented to Governor | |
2013-05-03 | House | Ordered engrossed, then enrolled |
2013-05-03 | Senate | Passed as amended by Conference Committee Report; YEAS 40 NAYS 0 |
2013-05-03 | Senate | Conference Committee Report adopted (506411) |
2013-05-03 | Senate | Conference Committee Report received |
2013-05-02 | Senate | In returning messages |
2013-05-02 | House | Passed as amended by Conference Committee Report; YEAS 117 NAYS 0 |
2013-05-02 | House | Conference Committee Report adopted (506411) |
2013-05-02 | House | Conference Committee Report considered |
2013-04-18 | House | Conference Committee appointed: Representatives Ingram (Chair), Broxson, Harrell, Hood, Peters, Rodrigues, Antone, Clarke-Reed, Coley (At Large), Gonzalez (At Large), Holder (At Large), O'Toole (At Large), Precourt (At Large), Schenck (At Large), Workman (At Large), Young (At Large), Gibbons (At Large), Jones (At Large), Rouson (At Large), Thurston (At Large), Waldman (At Large) |
2013-04-16 | House | In returning messages |
2013-04-16 | Senate | Immediately certified |
2013-04-16 | Senate | Conference Committee appointed: Appropriations Conference Committee: Negron (Chair), Benacquisto (Vice Chair), Flores (At Large), Gardiner (At Large), Margolis (At Large), Richter (At Large), Smith (At Large), Thrasher (At Large); Appropriations Conference Committee on Criminal and Civil Justice: Bradley (Chair), Clemens, Diaz de la Portilla, Garcia, Joyner; Appropriations Conference Committee on Education: Galvano (Chair), Bullard, Detert, Legg, Montford, Sachs, Thrasher; Appropriations Conference Committee on Finance and Tax: Hukill (Chair), Abruzzo, Altman, Brandes, Evers, Ring, Simmons; Appropriations Conference Committee on General Government: Hays (Chair), Braynon, Dean, Simpson, Soto, Stargel; Appropriations Conference Committee on Health and Human Services: Grimsley (Chair), Bean, Flores, Gibson, Sobel; Appropriations Conference Committee on Transportation, Tourism, and Economic Development: Gardiner (Chair), Latvala, Lee, Margolis, Thompson |
2013-04-16 | Senate | The Senate having refused to pass the bill as passed by the House, acceded to the request for a conference |
2013-04-16 | Senate | Passed as amended; YEAS 38 NAYS 0 |
2013-04-16 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2013-04-16 | Senate | Amendment(s) adopted (322536) |
2013-04-16 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2013-04-16 | Senate | Received |
2013-04-12 | Senate | In Messages |
2013-04-12 | House | Immediately certified |
2013-04-12 | House | Requests that the Senate pass the bill as passed by the House or agree to include the bill in the Budget Conference |
2013-04-12 | House | Passed; YEAS 115 NAYS 0 |
2013-04-12 | House | Read 3rd time |
2013-04-11 | House | Placed on 3rd reading |
2013-04-11 | House | Read 2nd time |
2013-04-09 | House | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 04/11/13 |
2013-04-03 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2013-04-03 | House | Favorable by- Appropriations Committee; YEAS 22 NAYS 0 |
2013-04-01 | House | On Committee agenda-- Appropriations Committee, 04/03/13, 12:30 pm, Webster Hall |
2013-03-28 | House | Introduced |
2013-03-28 | House | Referred to Appropriations Committee |
2013-03-28 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H1261 (Similar To) 2013-05-03 - Died in Government Operations Subcommittee, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 1309 (Ch. 2013-154), HB 5401 (Ch. 2013-54)
H1309 (Similar To) 2013-06-10 - Chapter No. 2013-154
H5001 (Similar To) 2013-04-12 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see SB 1500 (Ch. 2013-40), HB 5401 (Ch. 2013-54), HB 5501 (Ch. 2013-55), HB 5503 (Ch. 2013-56), CS/SB 406 (Ch. 2013-42), CS/CS/SB 1076 (Ch. 2013-27), SB 1502 (Ch. 2013-41), SB 1504 (Ch. 2013-43), SB 1512 (Ch. 2013-44), SB 1514 (Ch. 2013-45), SB 1516 (Ch. 2013-46), SB 1518 (Ch. 2013-47), SB 1520 (Ch. 2013-48), SB 1522 (Ch. 2013-49), CS/CS/SB 1660 (Ch. 2013-50), CS/CS/SB 1720 (Ch. 2013-51), SB 1802 (Ch. 2013-52), SB 1810 (Ch. 2013-53)
S1150 (Similar To) 2013-04-29 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 1309 (Ch. 2013-154), HB 5401 (Ch. 2013-54)
S1500 (Similar To) 2013-05-21 - Chapter No. 2013-40, companion bill(s) passed, see HB 5401 (Ch. 2013-54), HB 5501 (Ch. 2013-55), HB 5503 (Ch. 2013-56), CS/SB 406 (Ch. 2013-42), CS/CS/SB 1076 (Ch. 2013-27), SB 1502 (Ch. 2013-41), SB 1504 (Ch. 2013-43), SB 1512 (Ch. 2013-44), SB 1514 (Ch. 2013-45), SB 1516 (Ch. 2013-46), SB 1518 (Ch. 2013-47), SB 1520 (Ch. 2013-48), SB 1522 (Ch. 2013-49), CS/CS/SB 1660 (Ch. 2013-50), CS/CS/SB 1720 (Ch. 2013-51), SB 1802 (Ch. 2013-52), SB 1810 (Ch. 2013-53)
S1764 (Similar To) 2013-05-03 - Died in Messages, companion bill(s) passed, see HB 5401 (Ch. 2013-54)
H1309 (Similar To) 2013-06-10 - Chapter No. 2013-154
H5001 (Similar To) 2013-04-12 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see SB 1500 (Ch. 2013-40), HB 5401 (Ch. 2013-54), HB 5501 (Ch. 2013-55), HB 5503 (Ch. 2013-56), CS/SB 406 (Ch. 2013-42), CS/CS/SB 1076 (Ch. 2013-27), SB 1502 (Ch. 2013-41), SB 1504 (Ch. 2013-43), SB 1512 (Ch. 2013-44), SB 1514 (Ch. 2013-45), SB 1516 (Ch. 2013-46), SB 1518 (Ch. 2013-47), SB 1520 (Ch. 2013-48), SB 1522 (Ch. 2013-49), CS/CS/SB 1660 (Ch. 2013-50), CS/CS/SB 1720 (Ch. 2013-51), SB 1802 (Ch. 2013-52), SB 1810 (Ch. 2013-53)
S1150 (Similar To) 2013-04-29 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 1309 (Ch. 2013-154), HB 5401 (Ch. 2013-54)
S1500 (Similar To) 2013-05-21 - Chapter No. 2013-40, companion bill(s) passed, see HB 5401 (Ch. 2013-54), HB 5501 (Ch. 2013-55), HB 5503 (Ch. 2013-56), CS/SB 406 (Ch. 2013-42), CS/CS/SB 1076 (Ch. 2013-27), SB 1502 (Ch. 2013-41), SB 1504 (Ch. 2013-43), SB 1512 (Ch. 2013-44), SB 1514 (Ch. 2013-45), SB 1516 (Ch. 2013-46), SB 1518 (Ch. 2013-47), SB 1520 (Ch. 2013-48), SB 1522 (Ch. 2013-49), CS/CS/SB 1660 (Ch. 2013-50), CS/CS/SB 1720 (Ch. 2013-51), SB 1802 (Ch. 2013-52), SB 1810 (Ch. 2013-53)
S1764 (Similar To) 2013-05-03 - Died in Messages, companion bill(s) passed, see HB 5401 (Ch. 2013-54)