FL S1764 | 2013 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 3 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-03 - Died in Messages, companion bill(s) passed, see HB 5401 (Ch. 2013-54)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Requiring the Executive Office of the Governor to establish a single website providing access to other websites; requiring the office to establish a website providing information about fiscal planning for the state and specifying the information to be included on the website; requiring the Department of Management Services to maintain a website that provides current information on state employees and officers; creating the User Experience Task Force to develop and recommend a design for consolidating existing state-managed websites, etc. APPROPRIATION:

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Transparency in Government Spending

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2013-03-27 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#11 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2013-05-03HouseDied in Messages, companion bill(s) passed, see HB 5401 (Ch. 2013-54)
2013-04-04HouseIn Messages
2013-03-27SenatePassed as amended; YEAS 37 NAYS 0
2013-03-27SenateAmendment(s) adopted (519426)
2013-03-27SenateRead 3rd time
2013-03-19SenatePlaced on 3rd reading
2013-03-19SenateRead 2nd time
2013-03-14SenatePlaced on Special Order Calendar, 03/19/13
2013-03-14SenatePlaced on Calendar, on 2nd reading
2013-03-14SenateFavorable by- Appropriations; YEAS 16 NAYS 0
2013-03-12SenateIntroduced
2013-03-11SenateOn Committee agenda-- Appropriations, 03/14/13, 2:30 pm, 412 Knott Building
2013-03-11SenateReferred to Appropriations
2013-03-08SenateFiled
2013-03-08SenateSPB 7026 submitted as a committee bill (SB 1764) by Governmental Oversight and Accountability

Same As/Similar To

H1261 (Similar To) 2013-05-03 - Died in Government Operations Subcommittee, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 1309 (Ch. 2013-154), HB 5401 (Ch. 2013-54)
H1309 (Similar To) 2013-06-10 - Chapter No. 2013-154
H5401 (Similar To) 2013-05-20 - Chapter No. 2013-54, companion bill(s) passed, see SB 1500 (Ch. 2013-40)
S1150 (Similar To) 2013-04-29 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 1309 (Ch. 2013-154), HB 5401 (Ch. 2013-54)

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
215985Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback