FL H5303 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Enrolled on May 6 2011 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-06 - Ordered engrossed, then enrolled -HJ 1965
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Enrolled on May 6 2011 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-06 - Ordered engrossed, then enrolled -HJ 1965
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Revises provisions that specify amounts of revenue to be appropriated to James & Esther King Biomedical Research Program, William G. "Bill" Bankhead, Jr., & David Coley Cancer Research Program, & H. Lee Moffitt Cancer Center & Research Institute; specifies amounts of revenue to be appropriated to Sylvester Comprehensive Cancer Center of University of Miami & University of Florida Shands Cancer Center. APPROPRIATION:
Title
Biomedical Research
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-04-07 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#49 (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-04-07 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#140 (Y: 77 N: 41 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-06 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#129 (Y: 38 N: 77 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2011-04-07 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#140 (Y: 77 N: 41 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-06 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#129 (Y: 38 N: 77 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-06 | Ordered engrossed, then enrolled -HJ 1965 | |
2011-05-06 | In returning messages | |
2011-05-06 | Conference Committee Report considered -HJ 1223 | |
2011-04-26 | ||
2011-04-26 | Conference Committee appointed: Representatives Hudson (Chair), Chestnut, Corcoran, Davis, Diaz, Frishe, Harrell, Jones, Pafford, Roberson, K, Steube, Wood, Young -HJ 778 | |
2011-04-07 | In returning messages | |
2011-04-07 | In Messages | |
2011-04-07 | Read 3rd time -HJ 466 | |
2011-04-06 | Read 2nd time -HJ 440 | |
2011-04-01 | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 04/06/11 | |
2011-03-31 | Placed on Calendar -HJ 393 | |
2011-03-30 | Favorable by- Appropriations Committee; YEAS 13 NAYS 10 -HJ 393 | |
2011-03-28 | On Committee agenda-- Appropriations Committee, 03/30/11, 10:00 am, Webster Hall | |
2011-03-24 | Referred to Appropriations Committee -HJ 311 | |
2011-03-23 | Filed |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
215 | 5602 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
381 | 922 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |