FL H5009 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 3 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-03 - Chapter No. 2022-160
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 3 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-03 - Chapter No. 2022-160
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing eligible former employees to participate in the state group insurance program; removing certain benefit levels for certain health plans; requiring cost savings to an enrollee to include a specified waiver, unless prohibited under certain tax laws; requiring the Division of State Group Insurance to establish and maintain, or contract with other entities to establish and maintain, a designated anti-fraud unit for certain purposes, to adopt an anti-fraud plan; specifying that eligible former employees may obtain certain health insurance coverage within a specified time after their separation from employment; providing requirements for certain health insurance coverage options; removing language that certain additional appropriations are considered a state contribution, which result in an increase in the state premium, etc.
Title
State Group Insurance Program
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-14 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#16 (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-03-14 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#881 (Y: 108 N: 0 NV: 12 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-17 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#7 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-16 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#531 (Y: 117 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-14 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#881 (Y: 108 N: 0 NV: 12 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-17 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#7 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-16 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#531 (Y: 117 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-03 | Chapter No. 2022-160 | |
2022-06-02 | Approved by Governor | |
2022-06-02 | Signed by Officers and presented to Governor | |
2022-03-14 | House | Ordered engrossed, then enrolled |
2022-03-14 | House | In Messages |
2022-03-14 | Senate | Passed as amended by Conference Committee Report; YEAS 33 NAYS 0 |
2022-03-14 | Senate | Conference Committee Report adopted (334689) |
2022-03-14 | Senate | Conference Committee Report received |
2022-03-14 | Senate | In returning messages |
2022-03-14 | House | Passed as amended by Conference Committee Report; YEAS 108, NAYS 0 |
2022-03-14 | House | Conference Committee Report adopted |
2022-03-14 | House | Amendment 334689 adopted |
2022-03-14 | House | Conference Committee Report considered |
2022-03-11 | House | Conference Committee appointed |
2022-03-11 | House | Bill placed in Conference (Appropriations Conference Committee/Appropriations) |
2022-03-01 | Senate | Conference Committee appointed: Appropriations Conference Committee/Appropriations: Stargel (Chair), Bean (At Large), Book (At Large), Gibson (At Large), Mayfield (At Large), Passidomo (At Large), Perry (At Large), Powell (At Large), Rouson (At Large), Stewart (At Large); Appropriations Conference Committee on Agriculture, Environment, and General Government/Agriculture and Natural Resources: Albritton (Chair), Ausley, Berman, Boyd, Bradley, Brodeur, Garcia, Mayfield, Rodrigues, Stewart; Appropriations Conference Committee on Agriculture, Environment, and General Government/State Administration and Technology: Albritton (Chair), Ausley, Berman, Boyd, Bradley, Brodeur, Garcia, Mayfield, Rodrigues, Stewart; Appropriations Conference Committee on Criminal and Civil Justice/Justice: Perry (Chair), Baxley, Bracy, Gainer, Pizzo, Rodriguez, Torres, Wright; Appropriations Conference Committee on Education/Higher Education: Broxson (Chair), Cruz, Diaz, Gibson, Gruters, Hutson, Passidomo, Polsky; Appropriations Conference Committee on Education/PreK-12: Broxson (Chair), Cruz, Diaz, Gibson, Gruters, Hutson, Passidomo, Polsky; Appropriations Conference Committee on Health and Human Services/Health Care: Bean (Chair), Book, Brodeur, Burgess, Diaz, Farmer, Harrell, Jones, Rodrigues, Rodriguez, Rouson; Appropriations Conference Committee on Transportation, Tourism, and Economic Development/Infrastructure and Tourism: Gainer (Chair), Ausley, Boyd, Cruz, Garcia, Gibson, Hooper, Mayfield, Perry, Taddeo, Wright; |
2022-02-28 | Senate | Bill placed in Conference (Appropriations Conference Committee/Appropriations) |
2022-02-17 | House | In Messages |
2022-02-17 | Senate | Immediately certified |
2022-02-17 | Senate | The Senate having refused to pass the bill as passed by the House, acceded to the request for a conference |
2022-02-17 | Senate | Passed as amended; YEAS 38 NAYS 0 |
2022-02-17 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2022-02-17 | Senate | Amendment(s) adopted (105220) |
2022-02-17 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2022-02-17 | Senate | Received |
2022-02-17 | Senate | Substituted for SB 2506 |
2022-02-17 | Senate | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading |
2022-02-17 | Senate | Withdrawn from Appropriations |
2022-02-17 | Senate | Referred to Appropriations |
2022-02-17 | Senate | In Messages |
2022-02-17 | House | Immediately certified |
2022-02-17 | House | Requests that the Senate pass the bill as passed by the House or agree to include the bill in the Budget Conference |
2022-02-16 | House | Passed; YEAS 117, NAYS 0 |
2022-02-16 | House | Read 3rd time |
2022-02-15 | House | Added to Third Reading Calendar |
2022-02-15 | House | Placed on 3rd reading |
2022-02-15 | House | Read 2nd time |
2022-02-10 | House | 1st Reading (Original Filed Version) |
2022-02-10 | House | Bill added to Special Order Calendar (2/15/2022) |
2022-02-10 | House | Bill referred to House Calendar |
2022-02-09 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H5001 (Similar To) 2022-06-03 - Chapter No. 2022-156
S2500 (Similar To) 2022-02-17 - Laid on Table, refer to HB 5001
S2506 (Similar To) 2022-02-17 - Laid on Table, refer to HB 5009
S2500 (Similar To) 2022-02-17 - Laid on Table, refer to HB 5001
S2506 (Similar To) 2022-02-17 - Laid on Table, refer to HB 5009
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
110 | 123 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
110 | 12303 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
110 | 12306 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
110 | 12313 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
110 | 1239 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |