FL H4985 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 4 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-04 - Died in Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 4 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-04 - Died in Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Provides an appropriation for the Tallahassee New Jobs Workforce Development Program.
Title
Tallahassee New Jobs Workforce Development Program
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-04 | House | Died in Appropriations Committee |
2019-05-03 | House | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2019-03-11 | House | Now in Appropriations Committee |
2019-03-11 | House | Favorable by Transportation and Tourism Appropriations Subcommittee; YEAS 8 NAYS 0 |
2019-03-07 | House | On Committee agenda-- Transportation and Tourism Appropriations Subcommittee, 03/11/19, 11:00 am, Reed Hall |
2019-03-05 | House | Introduced |
2019-02-24 | House | Referred to Transportation and Tourism Appropriations Subcommittee; Appropriations Committee |
2019-02-20 | House | Filed |
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/4985 |
Text | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/4985/BillText/Filed/PDF |