FL H4559 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on November 22 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-03-14 - Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Provides an appropriation for the Central Florida Mobile STEM Lab.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Central Florida Mobile STEM Lab

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-14HouseIndefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
2020-01-14HouseIntroduced
2019-12-12HouseNow in Appropriations Committee
2019-12-12HouseFavorable by PreK-12 Appropriations Subcommittee; YEAS 11 NAYS 0
2019-12-02HouseOn Committee agenda-- PreK-12 Appropriations Subcommittee, 12/12/19, 9:00 am, Reed Hall
2019-11-25HouseReferred to PreK-12 Appropriations Subcommittee; Appropriations Committee
2019-11-22HouseFiled

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback