FL H4515 | 2022 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on November 30 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2022-01-21 - Added to Justice Appropriations Subcommittee Consent Agenda
Pending: House Justice Appropriations Subcommittee Committee
Hearing: Jan 25 @ 3:30 pm House Justice Appropriations Subcommittee Hearing
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Provides an appropriation for the New Americans Project.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

New Americans Project

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2022-01-21HouseAdded to Justice Appropriations Subcommittee Consent Agenda
2022-01-11House1st Reading (Original Filed Version)
2021-12-08HouseNow in Justice Appropriations Subcommittee
2021-12-08HouseReferred to Appropriations Committee
2021-12-08HouseReferred to Justice Appropriations Subcommittee
2021-11-30HouseFiled

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback