FL H4443 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on June 29 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-29 - Vetoed by Governor; See HB 5001 (line item 114)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Vetoed on June 29 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-29 - Vetoed by Governor; See HB 5001 (line item 114)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Provides an appropriation for the First Tee (CHAMP) Comprehensive Health and Mentoring Program for At Risk and Developmentally Disabled Students and Young Adults.
Title
First Tee (CHAMP) Comprehensive Health and Mentoring Program for At Risk and Developmentally Disabled Students and Young Adults
Sponsors
Rep. Evan Jenne [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-29 | Vetoed by Governor; See HB 5001 (line item 114) | |
2020-03-19 | House | See HB 5001 (line item 114) |
2020-03-14 | House | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2020-01-14 | House | Introduced |
2019-12-12 | House | Now in Appropriations Committee |
2019-12-12 | House | Favorable by PreK-12 Appropriations Subcommittee; YEAS 11 NAYS 0 |
2019-12-02 | House | On Committee agenda-- PreK-12 Appropriations Subcommittee, 12/12/19, 9:00 am, Reed Hall |
2019-11-25 | House | Referred to PreK-12 Appropriations Subcommittee; Appropriations Committee |
2019-11-21 | House | Filed |
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2020/4443 |
Text | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2020/4443/BillText/Filed/PDF |