FL H4315 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 4 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-04 - Died in Agriculture and Natural Resources Appropriations Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 4 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-04 - Died in Agriculture and Natural Resources Appropriations Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Provides an appropriation for the Okaloosa County Jerry D. Mitchem Water Reclamation Facility Effluent Disposal Expansion.
Title
Okaloosa County Jerry D. Mitchem Water Reclamation Facility Effluent Disposal Expansion
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-04 | House | Died in Agriculture and Natural Resources Appropriations Subcommittee |
2019-05-03 | House | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2019-03-05 | House | Introduced |
2019-02-22 | House | Referred to Agriculture and Natural Resources Appropriations Subcommittee; Appropriations Committee |
2019-02-15 | House | Filed |
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/4315 |
Text | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/4315/BillText/Filed/PDF |