FL H4189 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 1 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-07 - Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 1 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-07 - Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Deletes provisions providing for death penalty for capital felonies; deletes provisions relating to representation in death penalty cases; repeals provisions relating to capital collateral representation, jurors in capital cases, prohibiting imposition of death sentence on defendant with mental retardation, determination of whether to impose sentence of death or life imprisonment for capital felony or capital drug trafficking felony, issuance of warrant of execution, stay of execution of death sentence, etc.
Title
Death Penalty
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-07 | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration | |
2011-03-10 | Referred to Criminal Justice Subcommittee; Judiciary Committee -HJ 211 | |
2011-03-08 | Introduced -HJ 140 | |
2011-03-01 | Filed |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
119 | 071 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
27 | 51 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
27 | 511 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
27 | 7001 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
27 | 7002 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
27 | 701 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
27 | 702 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
27 | 703 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
27 | 704 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
27 | 705 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
27 | 706 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
27 | 707 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
27 | 708 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
27 | 7081 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
27 | 709 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
27 | 7091 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
27 | 710 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
27 | 711 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
27 | 715 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
775 | 082 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
775 | 15 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
782 | 04 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
790 | 161 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
794 | 011 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
893 | 135 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
913 | 13 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
921 | 137 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
921 | 141 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
921 | 142 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
922 | 052 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
922 | 06 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
922 | 07 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
922 | 08 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
922 | 095 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
922 | 10 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
922 | 105 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
922 | 108 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
922 | 11 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
922 | 111 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
922 | 12 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
922 | 14 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
922 | 15 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
924 | 055 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
924 | 056 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
924 | 057 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
924 | 058 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
924 | 059 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
925 | 11 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
945 | 10 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2011/4189 |
Text | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2011/4189/BillText/Filed/HTML |