FL H4179 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on March 9 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-09 - Died in Messages
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on March 9 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-09 - Died in Messages
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Repeals provision relating to DCFS plan for deinstitutionalization of mental health patients & reports to Legislature on status of plan.
Title
Florida Mental Health Act
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-02-15 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#750 (Y: 116 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-09 | Died in Messages | |
2012-02-16 | In Messages | |
2012-02-15 | Passed; YEAS 116 NAYS 0 -HJ 616 | |
2012-02-15 | Read 3rd time -HJ 616 | |
2012-02-14 | Placed on 3rd reading | |
2012-02-14 | Read 2nd time -HJ 595 | |
2012-02-10 | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 02/14/12 | |
2012-02-07 | Placed on Calendar -HJ 549 | |
2012-02-07 | Favorable by- Health and Human Services Committee; YEAS 16 NAYS 0 -HJ 549 | |
2012-02-03 | On Committee agenda-- Health and Human Services Committee, 02/07/12, 1:30 pm, 404 HOB | |
2012-01-24 | Now in Health and Human Services Committee -HJ 283 | |
2012-01-24 | Favorable by Health and Human Services Access Subcommittee; YEAS 13 NAYS 0 -HJ 283 | |
2012-01-20 | On Committee agenda-- Health and Human Services Access Subcommittee, 01/24/12, 2:00 pm, Webster Hall | |
2012-01-12 | Referred to Health and Human Services Access Subcommittee; Health and Human Services Committee -HJ 216 | |
2012-01-10 | Introduced -HJ 155 | |
2012-01-03 | Filed |