FL H4077 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 8 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-08 - Died in Justice Appropriations Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 8 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-08 - Died in Justice Appropriations Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Provides an appropriation for the Contract Costs for the Sentencing of State Offenders to County Jail.
Title
Contract Costs for the Sentencing of State Offenders to County Jail
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-08 | House | Died in Justice Appropriations Subcommittee |
2017-05-05 | House | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2017-03-07 | House | Introduced |
2017-03-06 | House | Referred to Justice Appropriations Subcommittee; Appropriations Committee |
2017-02-28 | House | Filed |
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2017/4077 |
Text | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2017/4077/BillText/Filed/PDF |