FL H4077 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 25 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-07 - Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 25 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-07 - Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Removes provisions that specify certain transportation facilities as statewide transportation corridors.
Title
Transportation Corridors
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-03-24 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#69 (Y: 117 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-07 | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration | |
2011-03-25 | In Messages | |
2011-03-24 | Read 2nd time -HJ 295 | |
2011-03-22 | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 03/24/11 | |
2011-03-11 | Placed on Calendar -HJ 217 | |
2011-03-10 | Favorable by- Economic Affairs Committee; YEAS 16 NAYS 0 -HJ 217 | |
2011-03-08 | Introduced -HJ 134 | |
2011-02-22 | Favorable by Transportation and Highway Safety Subcommittee; YEAS 14 NAYS 0 -HJ 151 | |
2011-02-15 | On Committee agenda-- Transportation and Highway Safety Subcommittee, 02/22/11, 1:30 pm, 306 HOB | |
2011-02-01 | Referred to Transportation and Highway Safety Subcommittee; Economic Affairs Committee -HJ 134 | |
2011-01-18 | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S1774 () 2011-05-07 - Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration