FL H4011 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 12 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-07 - Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 12 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-07 - Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Repeals Dance Studio Act.
Title
Dance Studios
Sponsors
Rep. Matt Gaetz [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-07 | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration | |
2011-03-24 | Favorable by- Economic Affairs Committee; YEAS 15 NAYS 0 -HJ 314 | |
2011-03-22 | On Committee agenda-- Economic Affairs Committee, 03/24/11, 8:30 am, Reed Hall | |
2011-03-09 | Now in Economic Affairs Committee -HJ 189 | |
2011-03-08 | Introduced -HJ 131 | |
2011-03-04 | On Committee agenda-- Business and Consumer Affairs Subcommittee, 03/08/11, 1:00 pm, 12 HOB | |
2011-01-26 | Referred to Business and Consumer Affairs Subcommittee; Economic Affairs Committee -HJ 131 | |
2011-01-12 | Filed |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
205 | 1969 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
501 | 143 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2011/4011 |
Text | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2011/4011/BillText/Filed/HTML |