FL H3949 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on June 2 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-02 - Vetoed by Governor; See SB 2500 (line item 1502)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Vetoed on June 2 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-02 - Vetoed by Governor; See SB 2500 (line item 1502)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Provides an appropriation for the United Against Poverty Capital Improvements to Expand Capacity and Outreach.
Title
United Against Poverty Capital Improvements to Expand Capacity and Outreach
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-11 - House - House Agriculture & Natural Resources Appropriations Subcommittee (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-02 | Vetoed by Governor; See SB 2500 (line item 1502) | |
2021-04-30 | House | See SB 2500 (line item 1502) |
2021-03-11 | House | Now in Appropriations Committee |
2021-03-11 | House | Reported out of Agriculture & Natural Resources Appropriations Subcommittee |
2021-03-11 | House | Favorable by Agriculture & Natural Resources Appropriations Subcommittee |
2021-03-09 | House | Added to Agriculture & Natural Resources Appropriations Subcommittee Consent Agenda |
2021-03-02 | House | 1st Reading (Original Filed Version) |
2021-02-23 | House | Now in Agriculture & Natural Resources Appropriations Subcommittee |
2021-02-23 | House | Referred to Appropriations Committee |
2021-02-23 | House | Referred to Agriculture & Natural Resources Appropriations Subcommittee |
2021-02-15 | House | Filed |