FL H3933 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 19 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-19 - Died in Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 19 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-19 - Died in Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Provides an appropriation for the Red Tent Women's Initiative, Inc.
Title
Red Tent Women's Initiative, Inc.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-19 | House | Died in Appropriations Committee |
2020-03-14 | House | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2020-01-14 | House | Introduced |
2019-12-20 | House | Now in Appropriations Committee |
2019-12-12 | House | Favorable by Justice Appropriations Subcommittee; YEAS 9 NAYS 0 |
2019-12-05 | House | On Committee agenda-- Justice Appropriations Subcommittee, 12/12/19, 4:00 pm, Reed Hall |
2019-11-25 | House | Referred to Justice Appropriations Subcommittee; Appropriations Committee |
2019-11-19 | House | Filed |
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2020/3933 |
Text | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2020/3933/BillText/Filed/PDF |