FL H3693 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 13 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-04 - See SB 2500 (line item 2307A)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 13 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-04 - See SB 2500 (line item 2307A)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Provides an appropriation for the United Way of Florida - Financial Literacy and Prosperity Program.
Title
United Way of Florida - Financial Literacy and Prosperity Program
Sponsors
Rep. Holly Raschein [R] | Rep. Nicholas Duran [D] | Rep. Joseph Geller [D] | Rep. Michael Gottlieb [D] |
Sen. Ana Rodriguez [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-04 | House | See SB 2500 (line item 2307A) |
2019-05-03 | House | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2019-03-10 | House | Now in Appropriations Committee |
2019-03-07 | House | Favorable by Transportation and Tourism Appropriations Subcommittee; YEAS 8 NAYS 0 |
2019-03-05 | House | On Committee agenda-- Transportation and Tourism Appropriations Subcommittee, 03/07/19, 12:00 pm, Reed Hall |
2019-03-05 | House | Introduced |
2019-02-15 | House | Referred to Transportation and Tourism Appropriations Subcommittee; Appropriations Committee |
2019-02-13 | House | Filed |
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/3693 |
Text | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/3693/BillText/Filed/PDF |