FL H3553 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 28 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-28 - Died in Civil Justice Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 28 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-28 - Died in Civil Justice Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Provides for appropriation to compensate Altavious Carter for injuries sustained as result of negligence of bus driver of Palm Beach County School District; provides limitation on payment of fees & costs.
Title
Relief/Altavious Carter/Palm Beach County School Board
Sponsors
Rep. Mike LaRosa [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-28 | House | Died in Civil Justice Subcommittee |
2015-03-08 | House | Referred to Civil Justice Subcommittee; Judiciary Committee |
2015-03-03 | House | Introduced |
2015-03-03 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S0072 (Same As) 2015-05-01 - Died in Appropriations
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2015/3553 |
Text | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2015/3553/BillText/Filed/PDF |