FL H3501 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 2 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-02 - Died in Civil Justice Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 2 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-02 - Died in Civil Justice Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Provides for appropriation to compensate Mark T. Sawicki & Sharon L. Sawicki for injuries sustained as result of negligence of City of Tallahassee; provides limitation on payment of fees & costs.
Title
Relief/Mark T. Sawicki & Sharon L. Sawicki/City of Tallahassee
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-02 | House | Died in Civil Justice Subcommittee |
2014-03-04 | House | Introduced |
2013-12-13 | House | Referred to Civil Justice Subcommittee; Judiciary Committee |
2013-11-05 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S0014 (Same As) 2014-05-02 - Died in Judiciary
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2014/3501 |
Text | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2014/3501/BillText/Filed/PDF |