FL H3477 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on May 4 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-04 - Died in Higher Education Appropriations Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on May 4 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-04 - Died in Higher Education Appropriations Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Provides an appropriation for the Seminole State College of Florida, STEM Building B, Altamonte Springs Campus.
Title
Seminole State College of Florida, STEM Building B, Altamonte Springs Campus
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-04 | House | Died in Higher Education Appropriations Subcommittee |
2019-05-03 | House | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2019-03-05 | House | Introduced |
2019-02-13 | House | Referred to Higher Education Appropriations Subcommittee; Appropriations Committee |
2019-02-11 | House | Filed |
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/3477 |
Text | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/3477/BillText/Filed/PDF |