FL H3463 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on November 14 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-19 - See HB 5001 (line item 2646)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on November 14 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-19 - See HB 5001 (line item 2646)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Provides an appropriation for the Shelter Upgrade Renovations - John Marble Park.
Title
Shelter Upgrade Renovations - John Marble Park
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-19 | House | See HB 5001 (line item 2646) |
2020-03-14 | House | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2020-01-14 | House | Introduced |
2019-11-25 | House | Referred to Transportation and Tourism Appropriations Subcommittee; Appropriations Committee |
2019-11-14 | House | Filed |
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2020/3463 |
Text | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2020/3463/BillText/Filed/PDF |