FL H3393 | 2022 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on November 17 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2022-01-18 - Now in Appropriations Committee
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Provides an appropriation for the St. Pete Beach Fire Station 22.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

St. Pete Beach Fire Station 22

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2022-01-18 - House - House State Administration & Technology Appropriations Subcommittee (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2022-01-18HouseNow in Appropriations Committee
2022-01-18HouseReported out of State Administration & Technology Appropriations Subcommittee
2022-01-18HouseFavorable by State Administration & Technology Appropriations Subcommittee
2022-01-13HouseAdded to State Administration & Technology Appropriations Subcommittee Consent Agenda
2022-01-11House1st Reading (Original Filed Version)
2021-11-24HouseNow in State Administration & Technology Appropriations Subcommittee
2021-11-24HouseReferred to Appropriations Committee
2021-11-24HouseReferred to State Administration & Technology Appropriations Subcommittee
2021-11-17HouseFiled

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback