FL H3371 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 15 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-08 - See SB 2500 (line item 310 A)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 15 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-08 - See SB 2500 (line item 310 A)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Provides an appropriation for the Adoption 2 Action.
Title
Adoption 2 Action
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-08 | House | See SB 2500 (line item 310 A) |
2017-05-05 | House | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2017-03-07 | House | Introduced |
2017-02-23 | House | Referred to Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee; Appropriations Committee |
2017-02-15 | House | Filed |
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2017/3371 |
Text | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2017/3371/BillText/Filed/PDF |