FL H3295 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on November 21 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-10 - Now in Appropriations Committee
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Provides an appropriation for the Communications Equipment Upgrade, Putnam County 700 MHZ SYSTEM PHASED MIGRATION.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Communications Equipment Upgrade, Putnam County 700 MHZ SYSTEM PHASED MIGRATION

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-01-10HouseNow in Appropriations Committee
2018-01-09HouseFavorable by Government Operations and Technology Appropriations Subcommittee; YEAS 12 NAYS 0
2018-01-09HouseIntroduced
2018-01-05HouseOn Committee agenda-- Government Operations and Technology Appropriations Subcommittee, 01/09/18, 1:00 pm, Morris Hall
2017-11-29HouseReferred to Government Operations and Technology Appropriations Subcommittee; Appropriations Committee
2017-11-21HouseFiled

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback