FL H3255 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on February 14 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-08 - See SB 2500 (line item 394)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 14 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-08 - See SB 2500 (line item 394)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Provides an appropriation for the North Miami Foundation for Senior Citizens' Services, Inc. - Meals for Elderly At Risk.
Title
North Miami Foundation for Senior Citizens' Services, Inc. - Meals for Elderly At Risk
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-08 | House | See SB 2500 (line item 394) |
2017-05-05 | House | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2017-03-07 | House | Introduced |
2017-02-23 | House | Referred to Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee; Appropriations Committee |
2017-02-14 | House | Filed |
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2017/3255 |
Text | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2017/3255/BillText/Filed/PDF |